SB83 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Government Affairs

Revises various provisions relating to the Nevada Indian Commission. (BDR 18-245)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Feb 01, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 15, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Feb 24, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 12, 2017     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 311   

Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 311.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

Apr 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 20, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)