AB69 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Transportation

Revises provisions relating to autonomous vehicles. (BDR 43-246)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 608.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 23, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Transportation     May 11, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     Jun 02, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 02, 2017   Yea 36,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 04, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 691     Amend. No. 1129   

Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 691.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

Jun 03, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1129.) To printer.

Jun 04, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1129 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 608.

Effective June 16, 2017.