SB94 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 27, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ford

Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-19)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 06, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Jan 27, 2017

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Jan 30, 2017

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 20, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)