AJR10* of the 78th (2015) Session View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 06, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Dooling, Gardner, Seaman, Shelton, Stewart, Trowbridge

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions relating to the compensation of certain elected officers. (BDR C-1068)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 07, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 28, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 13, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 06, 2017

  • Returned from Secretary of State.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 17, 2017

  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2017

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 26, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)