IP1 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 06, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)

Revises provisions relating to voter registration.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 13, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 14, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 16, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 06, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 08, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb 22, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 13, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 06, 2017

  • Received from Secretary of State.
  • Read first time.
  • Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 20, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 21, 2017

  • Read second time.

Feb 22, 2017

Feb 23, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Mar 09, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 10, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 13, 2017

Mar 14, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Mar 16, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Mar 21, 2017

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

Mar 22, 2017

  • Returned from Governor.
  • Initiative petition read.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.