SB110 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 08, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Woodhouse, Ford, Atkinson, Ratti, Denis, Manendo, Segerblom, Spearman, Carlton, Araujo, Frierson, Carrillo, Spiegel, Sprinkle, Swank

Revises provisions governing the process for a change of name. (BDR 3-142)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 107.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 28, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 02, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 20, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 09, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 08, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 16, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 08, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 09, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 06, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 07, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 08, 2017

Mar 09, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 09, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 15, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2017

May 17, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 18, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 107.

Effective May 24, 2017.