AB120 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 09, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Daly

Revises provisions relating to school construction. (BDR 34-779)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 01, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 12, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May 10, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Government Affairs     May 15, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 19, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 24,   Nay 18,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 570   

Bill History

Feb 09, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 10, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 21, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 570.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 20, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)