AB122 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 09, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Benitez-Thompson

Revises provisions related to the manner in which the State Board of Examiners awards compensation to certain victims of crime. (BDR 16-305)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 418.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 13, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Feb 13, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes      Heard in joint hearing, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 12, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 22, 2017     05:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 26, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 31, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 02, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 03, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 264   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 264   

Bill History

Feb 09, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 10, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 07, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 264.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 26, 2017

May 29, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 03, 2017

Jun 04, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 06, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 418.

Effective July 1, 2017.