AB123 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 09, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ellison

Revises provisions governing business organizations. (BDR 7-531)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 419.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 16, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 01, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 19, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 388     Amend. No. 870   

Bill History

Feb 09, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 10, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 388.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 25, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 870.) To printer.

May 26, 2017

Jun 03, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 870 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 06, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 419.

Effective October 1, 2017.