SB111 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 09, 2017.
By: Government Affairs

Revises provisions relating to the auditing of agencies of the Executive Department of the State Government. (BDR 31-552)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 13, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 17, 2017     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 20, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb 22, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 09, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 10, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 20, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 21, 2017

  • Read second time.

Feb 22, 2017

Feb 23, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 20, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)