AB128 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 09, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Spiegel

Exempts certain unpaid individuals from the requirement to obtain licensure as a process server. (BDR 54-700)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 126.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 01, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 15, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 42   

Bill History

Feb 09, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 10, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 42.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

Apr 24, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 15, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2017

May 18, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 25, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 126.

Effective October 1, 2017.