AB12 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 15, 2016.
By: Commerce and Labor

Makes various changes relating to insurance adjusters. (BDR 57-465)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 40.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 10, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 03, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 08, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 15, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 530   

Bill History

Nov 15, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 530.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 09, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 15, 2017

May 16, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 18, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 40.

Effective May 19, 2017, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on July 1, 2018, for all other purposes.