AJR4 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Swank, Segerblom

Requests the National Research Council of the National Academy of Sciences to conduct an independent scientific and economic analysis of the current management practices of the Colorado River, the impact of these practices on water security, flood protection and biodiversity recovery, and alternative management options, including draining Lake Powell and decommissioning and destroying the Glen Canyon Dam. (BDR R-101)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 06, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 11, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 13, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Natural Resources     May 16, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 25, 2017   Yea 30,   Nay 12,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 17, 2017

  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

May 20, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)