AB179 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carlton

Revises provisions governing massage therapy. (BDR 54-766)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 275.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 03, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Not considered
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 07, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 05, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 17, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 37,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 553     Amend. No. 779   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 553.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 779.) To printer.

May 23, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 24, 2017

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

May 25, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 779 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 275.

Effective June 1, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on July 1, 2017, for all other purposes.