SB19 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Education

Revises provisions relating to dual credit courses. (BDR 34-227)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 100.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Feb 09, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Feb 28, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 20, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     Apr 26, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     May 10, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 16, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 13   

Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 20, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 13.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2017

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 11, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2017

May 17, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 18, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 100.

Effective May 24, 2017, for the purposes of adopting regulations and performing any other administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.