SB145 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Spearman

Revises provisions relating to energy. (BDR 58-54)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 239.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 17, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 10, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 12, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 14, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 08, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 15, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May 22, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 24, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2017   Yea 36,   Nay 5,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 370   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 370.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

Apr 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 18, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 19, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2017

May 23, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 25, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 239.

Effective May 31, 2017, for the purpose of performing any preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2017, for all other purposes. Sections 1 to 2, inclusive, expire by limitation December 31, 2025.