SB150 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Spearman

Revises provisions related to energy efficiency programs. (BDR 58-568)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 591.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 03, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 15, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 10, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 12, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 08, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 08, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 17, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 27, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 02, 2017   Yea 34,   Nay 5,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 255   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 255.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 18, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 19, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.

May 30, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 31, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 02, 2017

Jun 03, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 591.

Effective June 15, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2017, for all other purposes.