AB203 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Joiner, Ratti

Revises provisions governing cemeteries. (BDR 40-723)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 77.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 06, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 03, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 05, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 11, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 430   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 430.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 08, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 11, 2017

May 15, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 17, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 23, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 77.

Effective May 23, 2017.