AB204 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Tolles, Bilbray-Axelrod, Bustamante Adams, Edwards, Frierson, Jauregui, Joiner, Krasner, Miller, Monroe-Moreno, Ohrenschall, Oscarson, Pickard, Spiegel, Titus, Wheeler, Yeager, Gansert, Cannizzaro, Ford, Hardy, Parks, Segerblom

Provides that marriage licenses and certificates of marriage may include the name to be used by each spouse after the marriage. (BDR 11-743)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 285.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 27, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 20, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 07, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 15, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 18, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     May 19, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 13, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 190     Amend. No. 228   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 190 and 228.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2017

Apr 17, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 285.

Effective January 1, 2018.