SB160 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gansert

Revises provisions relating to administrative regulations. (BDR 18-610)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 121.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 20, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 24, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 03, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 05, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 17, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 10   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 10.) To printer.

Apr 05, 2017

Apr 07, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 08, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 11, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 15, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2017

May 18, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 19, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 25, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 121.

Effective July 1, 2017.