AB205 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Araujo

Revises provisions relating to cremation. (BDR 40-649)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 406.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 08, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 73     Amend. No. 896   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 73.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 896.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

Jun 03, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 896 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 406.

Effective June 5, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.