SB162 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gansert

Revises provisions relating to psychological assistants, psychological interns and psychological trainees. (BDR 54-614)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 385.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 03, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 29, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 10, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 17, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 19, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 121     Amend. No. 725   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 121.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 725.) To printer.

May 22, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2017

May 29, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 725 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 385.

Effective July 1, 2017.