AB206 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Brooks, Frierson, Yeager, McCurdy II, Watkins, Fumo, Cancela, Parks, Spearman

Revises provisions relating to renewable energy and the renewable portfolio standard. (BDR 58-746)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 24, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          To Subcommittee
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 08, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Subcommittee heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 03, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Subcommittee recommends amend and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Not considered
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 15, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Not considered
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 17, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 26, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Jun 03, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 30,   Nay 12,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 817     Amend. No. 1126     Amend. No. 1144   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 07, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 817.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 12.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Jun 03, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1126.) To printer.

Jun 04, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1144.)
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . To Secretary's desk.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment Nos. 1126 and 1144 concurred in.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2017

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

Return to 2019 Session.