SB164 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Farley

Authorizes a school district to lease school buses or vehicles belonging to the school district in certain circumstances. (BDR 34-668)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 295.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Feb 21, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 11, 2017     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 01, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     May 17, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     May 18, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 19, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 33,   Nay 7,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 242     Amend. No. 789   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 18, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 242.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 789.) To printer.

May 24, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 789 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 295.

Effective June 1, 2017.