AB211 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Jauregui, Fumo, McCurdy II

Revises provisions governing compensation and wages. (BDR 53-764)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 27, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 08, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 12, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 544     Amend. No. 626   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 544.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 626.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.) To Senate.

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 20, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)