SB173 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cancela

Revises provisions relating to facilities for achievement charter schools. (BDR 34-629)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Bill read. No further consideration.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 08, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Education     Mar 09, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Mar 16, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Education     Apr 26, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     May 10, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 22, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 8,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 19, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Reconsideration    (1st Reprint)       May 19, 2017   Yea 33,   Nay 8,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 758   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 20, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 21, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 22, 2017

Mar 23, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 11, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 758.) To printer.

May 19, 2017

May 22, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 758 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.

Jun 02, 2017

  • Made Special Order of Business for Saturday, June 3, 2017, at 11:15 a.m.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Bill read. No further consideration.