SB176 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ford, Atkinson, Spearman, Cancela, Manendo, Parks, Ratti, Frierson, Neal, Thompson, Carrillo, Flores, Fumo, Jauregui, Joiner, McCurdy II, Miller, Monroe-Moreno, Ohrenschall, Spiegel, Yeager

Revises provisions relating to public safety. (BDR 23-666)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 129.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 06, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 22, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr 17, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 11, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 12, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 15, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Taxation     May 23, 2017     04:00 PM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 27, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 01, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 02, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 33,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 84   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 07, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 84.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 15, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 25, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 129.

Effective May 25, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any preliminary administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2018, for all other purposes.