SB194 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Denis, Parks, Cancela, Atkinson, Manendo, Ford, Ratti, Segerblom, Swank, Edwards, Frierson, Carrillo, Bilbray-Axelrod, Daly, Jauregui, Joiner

Prohibits the sale of products derived from or containing certain animal species under certain circumstances. (BDR 52-664)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 374.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 13, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 14, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 02, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 11, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 16, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 18, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2017   Yea 14,   Nay 6,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 25,   Nay 15,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 371     Amend. No. 897   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 28, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 371.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

Apr 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 897.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 897 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 374.

Effective January 1, 2018.