SJR6 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 27, 2017.
By: Commerce, Labor and Energy

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to provide for certain increases in the minimum wage. (BDR C-867)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 42.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 10, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 19, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 01, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 31, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 970     Amend. No. 1043   

Bill History

Feb 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 28, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 13, 2017.

May 19, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 22, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 31, 2017

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 970 and 1043.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Jun 04, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 05, 2017

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 42.

(Return to 2019 Session.)