SB224 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 27, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Harris

Requires cameras to be installed in certain classrooms within a public school which are used for special education. (BDR 34-477)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Exemption effective.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Mar 07, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Mar 30, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and re-refer

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 115   

Bill History

Feb 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 28, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 07, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 115.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 13, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.