SB232 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 01, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom, Manendo, Cancela, Parks, Woodhouse, Neal, Araujo, Daly, Joiner

Enacts the Domestic Workers' Bill of Rights. (BDR 53-887)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 550.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 20, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 12, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 03, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 17, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 19, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 28,   Nay 13,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 815     Amend. No. 929     Amend. No. 959   

Bill History

Mar 01, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 02, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 18, 2017

  • Read second time.

Apr 19, 2017

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 815 and 929.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 26, 2017

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 959.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 13, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

May 29, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 31, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 815, 929 and 959 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 12, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 550.

Effective June 12, 2017, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.