AB251 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 02, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hambrick, Cohen, Edwards, Fumo, Tolles, Parks

Authorizes the State Board of Pardons Commissioners to commute certain sentences of juvenile offenders. (BDR 16-304)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 308.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Mar 14, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Apr 13, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Judiciary     May 16, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 19, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 17, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 23, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 02, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Mar 03, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 14, 2017

  • Read second time.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 308.

Effective October 1, 2017.