AB261 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 07, 2017.
By: Transportation

Revises provisions governing motorcycle drivers' licenses and instruction permits. (BDR 43-837)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 178.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 23, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 04, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     Apr 27, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Transportation     May 18, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 13, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 19, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 138   

Bill History

Mar 07, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 08, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 138.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2017

Apr 17, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 18, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 19, 2017

May 22, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 178.

Effective May 26, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.