AB280 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Frierson, Carrillo, Monroe-Moreno, Sprinkle, Neal, Araujo, Benitez-Thompson, Bilbray-Axelrod, Carlton, Cohen, Daly, Fumo, Jauregui, Joiner, McCurdy II, Miller, Ohrenschall, Spiegel, Thompson, Tolles, Watkins, Yeager, Ford, Cannizzaro

Revises provisions relating to preferences in bidding for certain contracts for businesses based in this State. (BDR 27-1060)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 572.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 05, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 11, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 11, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 26, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Do pass, as amended
  Senate Finance     May 27, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Government Affairs     May 31, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 02, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 738     Amend. No. 1057   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 18, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 738.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

May 19, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 26, 2017

May 29, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Jun 01, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1057.) To printer.

Jun 02, 2017

Jun 05, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 1057 concurred in.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 572.

Effective July 1, 2017.