AB302 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 15, 2017.
By: Judiciary

Transfers the Division of Parole and Probation from the Department of Public Safety to the Department of Corrections. (BDR 16-596)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 15, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Apr 06, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Apr 13, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 340   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Mar 16, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 21, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 340.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

Jun 06, 2017

  • (No further action taken.)