SB308 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Harris, Ford, Cancela, Settelmeyer, Roberson, Cannizzaro, Denis, Farley, Gansert, Goicoechea, Hardy, Kieckhefer, Manendo, Parks, Ratti, Segerblom, Spearman, Woodhouse, Watkins, Pickard, Frierson, Yeager, Araujo, Bilbray-Axelrod, Brooks, Bustamante Adams, Carlton, Cohen, Daly, Diaz, Edwards, Flores, Fumo, Hambrick, Jauregui, Joiner, Kramer, McCurdy II, Monroe-Moreno, Ohrenschall, Spiegel, Sprinkle, Swank, Thompson, Tolles

Revises provisions relating to motor vehicle insurance. (BDR 43-938)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 258.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 28, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 13, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 09, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Transportation     May 18, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 20, 2017   Yea 16,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 32,   Nay 8,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 320   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 20, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 320.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2017

Apr 21, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 19, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 22, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 26, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 258.

Effective July 1, 2018.