AB335 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Edwards, Carrillo

Revises provisions governing motor vehicles and off-highway vehicles. (BDR 43-670)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 141.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 06, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 13, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     May 09, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Transportation     May 11, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 355   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 21, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 355.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 15, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2017

May 18, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 141.

Effective January 1, 2018.