SB339 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Settelmeyer

Revises provisions relating to the issuance of vintage license plates. (BDR 43-80)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 245.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Apr 06, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 11, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Transportation     May 16, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 24, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 169   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 21, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 169.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2017

Apr 25, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 18, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 19, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2017

May 23, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 25, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 245.

Effective January 1, 2018.