SB361 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cannizzaro, Segerblom, Manendo, Ratti, Farley, Atkinson, Cancela, Denis, Ford, Parks, Spearman, Woodhouse

Revises provisions related to domestic violence. (BDR 53-775)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 496.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 22, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized   Re-refer
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 06, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 14, 2017     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     May 12, 2017     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 25, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 31, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 22, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 700     Amend. No. 863     Amend. No. 1082   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2017

  • From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Judiciary.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 13, 2017.

May 19, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 700.) To printer.

May 22, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 863.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

May 23, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 03, 2017

Jun 04, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 1082 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 496.

Effective June 8, 2017, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.