AB29 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Transportation

Revises provisions governing off-highway vehicles. (BDR 18-220)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 504.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Feb 14, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Feb 17, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 24, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 11, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 13, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 08, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 11, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 20, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Transportation     May 23, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Transportation     May 25, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 09, 2017   Yea 26,   Nay 13,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 951   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 353     Amend. No. 950     Amend. No. 1123   

Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 03, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 353.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 08, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 09, 2017

May 11, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 951.)
  • Action of adoption of amendment rescinded.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 950.) To printer.

Jun 03, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1123.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . To Assembly.

Jun 04, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 950 concurred in.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1123 not concurred in.
  • Action reconsidered.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1123 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 504.

Effective June 9, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on July 1, 2017, for all other purposes.