AB384 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Thompson, McCurdy II, Flores, Araujo, Carrillo, Bilbray-Axelrod, Brooks, Bustamante Adams, Carlton, Daly, Frierson, Fumo, Miller, Monroe-Moreno, Neal, Ohrenschall, Sprinkle, Yeager, Ford, Atkinson, Spearman, Cancela, Parks, Denis, Segerblom, Woodhouse

Revises provisions governing the consideration of the criminal history of an applicant for employment by the State or a county, city or unincorporated town. (BDR 23-33)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 340.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 10, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 17, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 364     Amend. No. 952   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 364.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 25, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 952.) To printer.

May 26, 2017

May 29, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 952 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 340.

Effective January 1, 2018.