SB375 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom

Authorizes agreements between the Governor and Indian tribes in this State relating to the regulation of the use of marijuana. (BDR 18-321)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 305.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 06, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 01, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 16, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 17, 2017     10:00 AM      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2017   Yea 37,   Nay 3,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 299   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 299.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 18, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 19, 2017

  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 22, 2017

May 23, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 29, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 305.

Effective June 2, 2017.