SB384 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ratti

Provides for the confidentiality of certain information in the records and files of public employee retirement systems. (BDR 19-506)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
No further consideration.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 31, 2017     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 03, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 11, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2017   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 25,   Nay 14,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 150     Amend. No. 927   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 150.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

Apr 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 15, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2017

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 25, 2017

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 927.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 14, Excused: 3.)
  • To printer.

May 26, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 927 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Made Special Order of Business for Monday, June 5, 2017, at 11:30 a.m.
  • Bill read.
  • No further consideration.