AB395 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Frierson, Ohrenschall, Benitez-Thompson

Revises provisions governing juvenile justice. (BDR 5-853)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 477.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 27, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 08, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 31, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 02, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 02, 2017     04:37 PM          Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 31, 2017   Yea 39,   Nay 2,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 03, 2017   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 27, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 18, 2017

  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.

May 31, 2017

Jun 01, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 03, 2017

Jun 04, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 477.

Effective July 1, 2017.