AB405 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Brooks, Watkins, Frierson, Yeager, McCurdy II, Araujo, Bilbray-Axelrod, Carrillo, Cohen, Diaz, Fumo, Jauregui, Joiner, Miller, Monroe-Moreno, Neal, Swank, Thompson, Atkinson, Ford, Manendo, Segerblom, Spearman

Establishes certain protections for and ensures the rights of a person who uses renewable energy in this State and revises provisions governing net metering. (BDR 52-959)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 589.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 22, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            To Subcommittee
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 27, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 29, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Subcommittee heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 03, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Subcommittee recommends amend and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Not considered
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 10, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Not considered
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 12, 2017     12:15 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 24, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 26, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Jun 02, 2017     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Jun 02, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Jun 03, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Mentioned

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 2,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 04, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 723     Amend. No. 1100   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.

May 19, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 22, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 723.) To printer.

May 23, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 2, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Jun 03, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1100.) To printer.

Jun 04, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1100 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 589.

Sections 25 to 28.5, inclusive, 29 to 33, inclusive, and 34 of this act effective June 15, 2017. Sections 1 to 24, inclusive, of this act effective on September 1, 2017. If the Legislature provides by law for an open, competitive retail electric energy market for all electricity customers within a service territory, including, without limitation, if the Legislature does so as a result of the proposed state constitutional amendment known as the Energy Choice Initiative, section 28.7 of this act becomes effective with regard to the customers within that service territory on the date on which such customers have the right to choose the provider of their electric utility service pursuant to that law. As used in this section, "electricity customer" means every person, business, association of persons or businesses, state agency, political subdivision of this State or any other entity in this State that is a customer of a provider of electric service.