SB420 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cannizzaro

Revises provisions governing pupil publications in public schools and student publications in the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-776)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 321.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 13, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 08, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Education     May 15, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 30,   Nay 11,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 609     Amend. No. 747   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 609.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 747.) To printer.

May 24, 2017

May 25, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 747 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 321.

Effective October 1, 2017.