AB420 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 27, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ohrenschall

Revises provisions governing the use of electronic devices by offenders. (BDR 16-1073)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 538.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Apr 13, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     May 04, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     May 04, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     May 16, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 18, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Reconsideration    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 29,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 827   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 417   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Mar 28, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 417.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 827.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

Jun 03, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 827 not concurred in. To Senate.
  • In Senate.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 827 receded from.
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 538.

Effective June 9, 2017, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.