AB374 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Sprinkle, Frierson, Araujo, Carlton, Cohen, Elliot Anderson, Benitez-Thompson, Bilbray-Axelrod, Brooks, Bustamante Adams, Carrillo, Daly, Diaz, Flores, Fumo, Jauregui, Joiner, McCurdy II, Miller, Neal, Ohrenschall, Spiegel, Swank, Thompson, Watkins, Yeager

Requires the Department of Health and Human Services, if authorized by federal law, to establish a health care plan within Medicaid for purchase by persons who are not otherwise eligible for Medicaid. (BDR 38-881)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 07, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Senate Finance     Apr 28, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 24, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 31, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 13,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 02, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 745   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.

May 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 745.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

May 22, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.

May 30, 2017

May 31, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 01, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 02, 2017

Jun 03, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2017

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

Return to 2019 Session.