Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

79th (2017) Session
Bills Effective January 1, 2019



This list contains those bills which take effect on January 1, 2019, either in part or as a whole.


AB45 Revises provisions relating to public office. (BDR 24-426)
  Sections 1 to 23, inclusive, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30 to 38, inclusive, and 39 of this act effective on July 1, 2017. Sections 23.5, 23.7, 24.2, 24.5, 25.2, 25.4, 26.5, 27.1, 27.11, and 27.2 of this act effective on: (a) January 1, 2018, for purposes of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and (b) January 1, 2019, for all other purposes.

AB181 Revises provisions governing the restoration of civil rights for certain ex-felons. (BDR 14-720)
  Effective January 1, 2019.

AB190 Requires certain health and safety training for entertainment industry workers and supervisors. (BDR 53-151)
  Sections 1 to 13, inclusive, 16, and 17 of this act effective on January 1, 2018. Sections 14 and 15 of this act effective on January 1, 2019.

AB381 Revises provisions governing prescription drugs covered by certain policies of health insurance. (BDR 57-698)
  Effective January 1, 2019.

AB454 Makes various changes to provisions relating to professions. (BDR 54-109)
  Sections 1 to 13, inclusive, 14, 15 to 31, inclusive, and 32 to 45, inclusive, and 46 of this act effective June 9, 2017. Sections 41.1 to 41.9, inclusive, of this act effective July 9, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on January 1, 2018, for all other purposes. Sections 13.5, 14.2 to 14.8, inclusive, and 31.5 of this act effective on January 1, 2019.

SB286 Revises provisions governing the regulation of applied behavior analysis. (BDR 39-633)
  Sections 74 and 78 effective June 14, 2017. Sections 1 to 71, inclusive, 73, 75, 76 and 77 effective January 1, 2019. Section 72 effective July 1, 2026. Sections 22 and 32 expire by limitation the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States.

SB415 Proposes to exempt sales of feminine hygiene products from sales and use taxes and analogous taxes. (BDR 32-631)
  Sections 1 to 9, inclusive, and section 13 effective October 1, 2017. Sections 10, 11 and 12 effective January 1, 2019, and expire by limitation December 31, 2028, only if the proposal submitted pursuant to sections 2 to 9, inclusive, of this act is approved by the voters at the General Election, November 6, 2018.

SB466 Makes various changes relating to the State Board of Oriental Medicine. (BDR 54-557)
  Effective October 1, 2017. Section 4 expires by limitation January 1, 2019.




Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo