Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

79th (2017) Session
Bills Effective July 1, 2018



This list contains those bills which take effect on July 1, 2018, either in part or as a whole.


SB26 Makes certain changes concerning governmental entities that contract with or invest in companies that boycott Israel. (BDR 27-418)
  Effective June 2, 2017, for the purposes of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2018, for all other purposes.

SB107 Authorizes ethnic and diversity studies in public high schools. (BDR 34-116)
  Effective May 24, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2018, for all other purposes.

SB132 Revises provisions relating to public high schools. (BDR 34-47)
  Effective July 1, 2018.

SB141 Revises provisions relating to special license plates for veterans with a qualifying service-connected disability. (BDR 43-636)
  Sections 1, 2, 4 and 9 of this act become effective on July 1, 2017. Sections 3 and 5 to 8, inclusive, of this act become effective on the earlier of July 1, 2018, or the date on which the Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles notifies the Governor and the Director of the Legislative Counsel Bureau that sufficient resources are available to enable the Department to carry out the provisions of chapter 62, Statutes of Nevada 2015, page 262.

SB176 Revises provisions relating to public safety. (BDR 23-666)
  Effective May 25, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any preliminary administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2018, for all other purposes.

SB191 Establishes a standard for evidence of eligibility for any benefit, program or assistance provided to a veteran with a military service-connected disability. (BDR 37-803)
  Sections 1, 2, 3, 5, 7, 8 and 9 of this act become effective May 29, 2017. Sections 4 and 6 of this act become effective on the earlier of: July 1, 2018; or the date on which the Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles, pursuant to section 7 of chapter 62, Statutes of Nevada 2015, page 268, notifies the Governor and the Director of the Legislative Counsel Bureau that sufficient resources are available to enable the Department to carry out the amendatory provisions of chapter 62, Statutes of Nevada 2015, page 262.

SB200 Revises provisions relating to instruction in computer education and technology. (BDR 34-266)
  Effective June 15, 2017, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act. For all other purposes: Sections 1, 4, 7, 8, 8.5, 9 and 10 effective July 1, 2017. Sections 3, 4.5, 5 and 5.5 effective July 1, 2018. Section 6 effective July 1, 2020. Sections 2 and 8.3 effective July 1, 2022.

SB212 Revises provisions governing the welfare of pupils. (BDR 34-674)
  Effective July 1, 2018.

SB241 Provides for the establishment of the State Seal of STEM Program and the State Seal of STEAM Program. (BDR 34-680)
  Effective May 24, 2017, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2018, for all other purposes.

SB244 Revises provisions relating to historic preservation. (BDR 33-515)
  Section 39 effective June 9, 2017. Sections 38.3, 38.5 and 38.7 effective on July 1, 2017. Sections 1 to 38, inclusive, effective: June 9, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and on July 1, 2018, for all other purposes.

SB308 Revises provisions relating to motor vehicle insurance. (BDR 43-938)
  Effective July 1, 2018.

SB322 Revises provisions governing the requirement for an examination in civics as a condition for graduation from high school. (BDR 34-993)
  Sections 1, 2 and 4 effective July 1, 2018. Section 3 effective July 1, 2019.

SB391 Provides for awards of scholarships by community colleges in the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-815)
  Sections 1 to 15 and 20, inclusive, and 17, 18, 18.5 and 19 effective June 8, 2017 for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on July 1, 2017, for all other purposes. Section 18.3 effective on July 1, 2017. Section 16 effective June 8, 2017 for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on July 1, 2018, for all other purposes.

SB452 Revises provisions governing certificates of title for vehicles. (BDR 43-1067)
  Section 7.1 effective June 5, 2017. Sections 1 to 6, inclusive, effective June 5, 2017, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act. Section 5.5 effective July 1, 2017, for all other purposes. Sections 1 to 5, inclusive, and 6 effective July 1, 2018, for all other purposes.




Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo